IL SB1519 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that any taxing district may order the county clerk to abate all or a portion of the taxes levied by the taxing district on certain tool and die business property. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-TOOL AND DIE ABATEMENT
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Connelly [R] | Sen. Dan Kotowski [D] | Sen. Pamela Althoff [R] | Sen. Steven Landek [D] |
Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] | Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] | Rep. Keith Farnham [D] | Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2013-05-02 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2013-04-24 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2013-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2013-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2013 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 011-000-000 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Revenue |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 18-184.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |