IL SB1501 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Not For Profit Corporation Act of 1986. Provides that in its annual report filed with the Secretary of State, a domestic or foreign corporation shall include the aggregated demographic information of its directors and officers, including race, ethnicity, gender, disability status, veteran status, sexual orientation, and gender identity. Provides that no later than 30 calendar days after filing the annual report with the Secretary of State, a corporation shall post to the corporation's publicly available website, if one exists, the aggregated demographic information of the corporation's directors and officers. Effective January 1, 2024.
Title
NOT FOR PROFIT-DEMOGRAPHICS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Re-assigned to Judiciary |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), the following amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
805 | 105 | 114.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
805 | 105 | 114.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |