IL SB1499 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0281
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0281
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Cook County Forest Preserve District Act. Provides that any forest preserve district shall have the power to acquire land, in fee simple or by easement, for the following purposes: to create a forest preserve, for the consolidation of forest preserve units, to connect forest preserve units, to preserve and manage the water resources of the forest preserve district along water courses, and to provide for the extension of roads and parking for forest preserves. Further provides that any forest preserve district shall have the power to acquire land by easement as it shall deem necessary or desirable for public use of forest preserves. Provides that property owned by a forest preserve district and property in which a forest preserve district is the grantee of a conservation easement or the grantee of a conservation right shall not be subject to eminent domain or condemnation proceedings. Effective immediately.
Title
FOREST PRESERVE EASEMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0281 |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date August 9, 2013 |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2013-05-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 004-000-000 |
2013-04-08 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-13 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly Burke |
2013-03-13 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2013 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2013 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 013-000-000 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 810 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 810 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 810 | 8.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |