IL SB1489 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0026
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0026
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Green Infrastructure for Clean Water Act. Requires the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency to adopt comprehensive storm water management rules that meet certain requirements by July 1, 2012. Requires the Agency, beginning in 2010, to implement a storm water permit fee program adequate to support the adoption and implementation of State storm water regulations as required by the Act. Requires the Agency to establish a Statewide standard for storm water management programs in order to transition toward the use of green infrastructure as the predominant storm water management strategy. Requires the Agency to review its rules on the distribution of money from the Water Revolving Fund and to endeavor to establish new criteria which prioritize the use of green infrastructure in all projects involving storm water management and water efficiency.
Title
GREEN INFRASTRUCTURE ACT
Sponsors
Sen. Pamela Althoff [R] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Susan Garrett [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] |
Sen. Martin Sandoval [D] | Sen. Ira Silverstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-27 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-30 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0026 | |
2009-06-30 | Effective Date June 30, 2009 | |
2009-06-30 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-27 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-27 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000 | |
2009-05-26 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Environment; 006-000-000 | |
2009-05-22 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Environment | |
2009-05-19 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-19 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Iris Y. Martinez | |
2009-05-15 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 17, 2009 | |
2009-05-15 | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Mulligan | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-05-14 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-30 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-29 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Environment & Energy Committee; 017-000-000 | |
2009-04-29 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Environment & Energy Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-04-29 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Environment & Energy Committee | |
2009-04-29 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell | |
2009-04-20 | Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee | |
2009-04-06 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-06 | First Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon | |
2009-04-03 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz | |
2009-04-03 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-02 | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Martinez | |
2009-04-02 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval | |
2009-03-31 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Environment; 008-000-000 | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Environment | |
2009-03-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 31, 2009 | |
2009-03-30 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass as Amended Environment; 008-000-000 | |
2009-03-11 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez | |
2009-03-04 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2009-02-27 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2009-02-25 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Susan Garrett | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to Environment | |
2009-02-18 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-18 | First Reading | |
2009-02-18 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |