IL SB1486 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0443
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0443
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code and the School Safety Drill Act. In provisions concerning home or hospital instruction, adds references to advanced practice nurses. In provisions concerning required high school courses, removes obsolete language. Provides that private schools that do not utilize a bus to transport students are exempt from conducting bus evacuation drills, with conditions. Effective July 1, 2017.
Title
SCH CD-COURSE REQ-BUSES-NURSE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0443 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Effective Date August 25, 2017 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-001-000 |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000 |
2017-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2017-05-22 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-05 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2017-05-05 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Weaver |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 009-000-000 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 012-000-000 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 128 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 128 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 10-22.6a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 14-13.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27-22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |