IL SB1480 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Line of Duty Compensation Act to increase the burial benefit from $10,000 to $20,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LINE OF DUTY BURIAL BENEFIT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee
2019-03-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-03-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-13HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-03-13HouseArrived in House
2019-03-13SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-001-000
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2019-03-12SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019
2019-03-07SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2019-03-06SenateDo Pass State Government; 009-000-000
2019-03-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-03-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-02-20SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8203153.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback