IL SB1479 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on July 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0103
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on July 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0103
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
BOATING UNDER THE INFLUENCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-22 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0103 |
2013-07-22 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-07-22 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2013-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Transportation |
2013-05-23 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-23 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 17, 2013 |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2013-05-16 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2013-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2013-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2013-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2013-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2013-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2013-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-05-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2013-05-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-05-15 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2013-05-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Scott Drury |
2013-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2013-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2013-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2013-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2013-04-29 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2013-04-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-29 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2013-04-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2013 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Morrison |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 18, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 015-000-000 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2013 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 1-100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |