IL SB1478 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0441
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0441
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Radiation Protection Act of 1990. Abolishes the Radiologic Technologist Accreditation Advisory Board.
Title
RADIOLOGIC ADVISORY BD-ABOLISH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0441 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 015-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2017-05-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-15 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2017-05-05 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2017 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 005-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
420 | 40 | 15 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |