IL SB1473 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Assembly Operations Act. Provides that if a bill or other legislative measure is sponsored or co-sponsored by a majority of the members elected to the chamber in which the bill or other legislative measure then resides, then that bill or other legislative measure must be referred by the appropriate committee of that chamber to a standing committee and a vote on that bill or other legislative measure must be taken by that standing committee within 6 session days or before any committee action or floor action deadline that has been imposed in that chamber, whichever is sooner.
Title
BILLS-MAJORITY MEMBERS SPONSOR
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Subcommittee on Governmental Operations |
2013-02-28 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Governmental Operations |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Matt Murphy |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1473&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB1473.htm |