IL SB1469 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Food Handling Regulation Enforcement Act. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall work with the Farmers' Market Task Force to address farmers' market vendor complaints regarding the reasonableness of local health departments' fees and sanitation provisions. Provides that farmers' market vendors shall provide effective means to maintain potentially hazardous food at or below a specified temperature. Provides that handwashing stations may be shared by farmers' market vendors. Makes additions to the list of non-potentially hazardous foods that are allowed in provisions concerning the regulation of cottage food operations. Removes an exemption from provisions concerning the regulation of cottage food operations that applies when the gross receipts from the sale of food do not exceed $36,000 in a calendar year. Provides that no later than December 31, 2017, the Department shall include in the Department's cottage food operation application form a statement containing specified content. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FARMERS' MARKETS-COTTAGE FOOD

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-17HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-05-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2017-05-03HouseAssigned to Business Incentives for Local Communities Committee
2017-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateDo Pass as Amended Public Health; 008-000-000
2017-03-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2017-03-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter
2017-03-02SenatePostponed - Public Health
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Public Health
2017-02-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4106253.3Amended CodeCitation Text
4106254Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback