IL SB1469 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Provides that the county board or board of county commissioners shall hold a public hearing regarding the county's annual budget after making the budget available for public inspection and at least 7 days prior to the board's final action on the budget. Effective immediately.
Title
CNTY CD-BUDGET HEARING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 6-1001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1469&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB1469.htm |