IL SB1468 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides that except as provided in the Code, it is unlawful to have in his or her possession the green hides of fur bearing mammals without a valid hunting or trapping license. Provides that the annual fee for each resident fur buyer's permit (rather than a resident retail or wholesale fur buyer's permit) shall be $50.00 (rather than $25.00 for a resident retail fur buyer's permit or $125.00 for a resident wholesale fur buyer's permit). Provides that all fur buyers and non-resident auction participants shall maintain records of the receipt, collection, purchase, and sale of green hides of fur-bearing mammals. Provides that a record of each transaction shall be created at the time it is executed specifying the date, numbers, and kinds of green hides purchased, sold, or transferred, price paid for each green hide, if any, and the name, address, and Department customer identification number of the other party. Provides that a person who holds a fur tanner's permit is exempt from provisions for a resident fur buyer permit holder as long as the person is not engaged in the business of receiving green hides for the purpose of buying or selling the hides, whether green, dressed, processed, or tanned and the hides which have been tanned or processed are returned to the person who submitted the hides for processing or tanning. Repeals a provision regarding the receiving, collecting, or buying of green hides of fur-bearing or game mammals. Makes other conforming changes. Effective January 1, 2018.
Title
WILDLIFE-TRAPPING-GREEN HIDES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Agriculture; 010-000-000 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Agriculture |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Postponed - Agriculture |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
520 | 5 | 2.35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 5 | 3.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 5 | 3.12 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
520 | 5 | 3.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 5 | 3.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 5 | 3.16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 5 | 3.16a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 5 | 3.18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 5 | 3.19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 5 | 3.20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 5 | 3.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |