IL SB1449 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Provides that an owner of real property that is located within the unincorporated boundaries of a township road district and has a residential roadway considered to be a private roadway, may transfer title to the roadway and any necessary easements to the township road district by entering into a binding written agreement with the township road district. Provides that the written agreement may include a provision for allocation of initial costs and fees for the construction or repair of the roadway at the time of transfer. Provides that upon the effective date of transfer and after any initial costs and fees allocated under the agreement, the roadway shall be maintained, repaired, and serviced by the township road district. Provides criteria for a roadway to be transferred in this manner. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PRIVATE ROAD TRANSFER-TOWNSHIP

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-05-30HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-30HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee; 007-004-000
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-11HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-05-03HouseAssigned to Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee
2017-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateDo Pass Local Government; 006-000-000
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Local Government
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Local Government
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
60556-801.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback