IL SB1449 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Police Act. Provides that the Department of State Police shall maintain a minimum force of 2,350 State Police Officers. Provides that the Governor, in consultation with the General Assembly and the Director of State Police, shall review every 4 years, commencing 4 years from the effective date of the amendatory Act, the minimum number of State Police Officers. Provides that the Director of State Police, in conjunction with the Department of State Police Merit Board, shall add State Police Officers to the Department as needed, in order to maintain the minimum allowable number of State Police Officers. Provides that the Director shall be responsible for the management and control of the additions of State Police Officers to the Department.
Title
STATE POLICE-MINIMUM FORCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2610 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |