IL SB1449 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Local Government Professional Services Selection Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
MUNI CD-TIF-LIST OF JOBS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-27 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2011 |
2011-05-20 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2011 |
2011-05-16 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote |
2011-05-16 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2011-05-13 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 20, 2011 |
2011-05-11 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-05-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-05 | House | First Reading |
2011-05-05 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2011-05-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-05-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Radogno |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 4, 2011 |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 015-000-000 |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2011 |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Radogno |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 013-000-000 |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000 |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 510 | 0.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |