IL SB1449 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0326
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0326
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Covering ALL KIDS Health Insurance Act. Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall permit private employers, as defined in the Day and Temporary Labor Services Act and doing business in Illinois, to enroll as unpaid application agents. Effective January 1, 2010.
Title
FREE HEALTH BENEFITS APP ASST
Sponsors
Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Mike Jacobs [D] | Sen. Emil Jones [D] | Sen. Heather Steans [D] |
Sen. Donne Trotter [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-11 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0326 | |
2009-08-11 | Effective Date August 11, 2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-14 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-14 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 | |
2009-05-06 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah L. Graham | |
2009-05-06 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-30 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-29 | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2009-04-20 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | |
2009-04-06 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-06 | First Reading | |
2009-04-06 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Susana A. Mendoza | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-02 | Third Reading - Passed; 045-008-001 | |
2009-04-02 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III | |
2009-04-02 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter | |
2009-04-02 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2009 | |
2009-03-31 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Jacobs | |
2009-03-31 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-31 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather Steans | |
2009-03-31 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 008-001-000 | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Jacobs | |
2009-03-05 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 6, 2009 | |
2009-03-05 | Do Pass Human Services; 008-000-000 | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to Human Services | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-18 | First Reading | |
2009-02-18 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Jacobs |