IL SB1432 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Safe Autonomous Vehicle Act. Provides definitions. Provides that upon notification to the Department of Motor Vehicles, a Motor Vehicle Manufacturer may commence a safe autonomous vehicle project with a vehicle installed with an Automated Driving System after providing notification to the Department of Motor Vehicles and after self-certification under certain conditions. Provides that the Manufacturer shall determine the geographical boundaries of the project and shall maintain incident records and provide periodic summaries to the Department and the National Highway Traffic Safety Administration. Provides that the Participating Fleet in the program shall be insured by the Manufacturer who shall assume liability for incidents where the automated driving system technology is at fault for that incident. Provides that any person operates a vehicle with automated driving system technology without first satisfying the eligibility requirements in the Act shall be fined $10,000 for a first violation and a second or subsequent violation is a Class A misdemeanor. Preempts home rule powers. Effective immediately.
Title
AUTONOMOUS VEHICLE ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |