IL SB1422 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that the prosecution shall not be required to prove at trial facts which extend the general limitations or establish periods excluded from the general limitations, when the facts supporting extension of or the exclusion from the period of general limitations are properly pled in the charging document. Provides that any challenge relating to the extension of or exclusion from the general limitations period shall be exclusively conducted under the dismissal of charges provisions of the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that when a defendant seeks dismissal of the charge upon the grounds that it is barred by the statute of limitations, the prosecution shall have the burden of proving, by a preponderance of the evidence, that the prosecution of the offense is not barred by the statute of limitations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM PRO-SOL-BURDEN OF PROOF

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-03HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 007-000-003
2017-03-14SenateReported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000
2017-03-01SenateTo Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
72053-6Amended CodeCitation Text
72053-7Amended CodeCitation Text
7255114-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback