IL SB1421 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-17 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Sex Offender Registration Act. Provides that a "sex offense" for the purposes of the Act includes residential burglary or home invasion committed on or after January 1, 2018 provided that the offense was sexually motivated as defined in the Sex Offender Management Board Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SEX OFFENDER REG-OFFENSES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-17SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-01SenateTo Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7301502Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback