IL SB1415 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Board of Legislative Repealers Act. Establishes the Board of Legislative Repealers. Directs the Board, among other things, to determine instances in which State laws and regulations are unreasonable, unduly burdensome, duplicative, onerous, in conflict, or unconstitutional, to create a system for receiving public comments, and to recommend changes in the law that it deems necessary to modify or eliminate antiquated and inequitable rules of law and to bring the law of the State into harmony with modern conditions. Authorizes the Board to set a schedule to make the investigations required by the Act and to adopt rules establishing the criteria to be used to determine whether a State law, regulation, or other governing instrument is unreasonable, unduly burdensome, duplicative, or onerous, or conflicts with another law, regulation, or governing instrument. Amends the Legislative Commission Reorganization Act of 1984 and the Legislative Reference Bureau Act. Requires the staff of the Legislative Reference Bureau and the Legislative Research Unit to cooperate to provide administrative support to the Board. Authorizes the Board to adopt any rules that are necessary to implement the requirements of the Act. Effective January 1, 2014.
Title
BOARD OF REPEALERS
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Dillard [R] | Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant [D] | Sen. Linda Holmes [D] | Sen. Michael Connelly [R] |
Sen. Melinda Bush [D] | Rep. Ronald Sandack [R] | Rep. Sandra Pihos [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-04-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-29 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2013-04-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2013-04-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2013 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Dillard |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 013-000-000 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 1, 2013 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 013-000-000 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 130 | 2-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
25 | 130 | 4-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
25 | 135 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |