IL SB1413 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0217
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0217
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Forestry Development Act. Changes "forestry management" to "forest management". Makes other name changes and revisions. Makes changes concerning cost share amounts and eligibility. Makes other changes. Creates the Forestry Development Council. Specifies the Council's membership and duties. Effective immediately.
Title
FORESTRY DEVELOPMENT
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] | Sen. Kirk Dillard [R] | Sen. Gary Forby [D] | Sen. David Koehler [D] |
Sen. John Sullivan [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-10 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0217 | |
2009-08-10 | Effective Date August 10, 2009 | |
2009-08-10 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-13 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-13 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-06 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-05 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-05 | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 010-000-000 | |
2009-04-23 | Re-assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee | |
2009-04-14 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-04-02 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell | |
2009-03-31 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Winters | |
2009-03-27 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-27 | First Reading | |
2009-03-27 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Richard P. Myers | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-03-26 | Arrived in House | |
2009-03-26 | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 | |
2009-03-26 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard | |
2009-03-26 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Brady | |
2009-03-19 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler | |
2009-03-13 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby | |
2009-02-27 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 4, 2009 | |
2009-02-27 | Second Reading | |
2009-02-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 26, 2009 | |
2009-02-25 | Do Pass as Amended Agriculture and Conservation; 010-000-000 | |
2009-02-25 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2009-02-25 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture and Conservation | |
2009-02-25 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-25 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to Agriculture and Conservation | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-11 | First Reading | |
2009-02-11 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan |