IL SB1404 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0277
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0277
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that notices of application for judgment and sale may be sent by first class mail (instead of registered or certified mail). Provides that the mailing must be supported by the certificate or affidavit of the employee of the county collector who mailed the document, stating the time and place of mailing or delivery, the complete address which appeared on the envelope or package, and the fact that the proper postage was prepaid. Effective January 1, 2014.
Title
PROP TX-NOTICE-JUDGMENT SALE
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0277 |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date August 9, 2013 |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-001 |
2013-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-000-000 |
2013-05-09 | House | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee |
2013-05-09 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 005-000-000 |
2013-05-02 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2013-04-29 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2013-04-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-29 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2013-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2013 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Haine |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 012-000-000 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2013 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 1, 2013 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 010-000-000 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 21-135 | Amended Code | Citation Text |