IL SB1403 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Provides that the court may order the sealing of the records of arrests or charges not initiated by arrest which result in an order of supervision or a conviction for a misdemeanor violation of public indecency. Provides that the court may not order the sealing of the records of arrests or charges not initiated by arrest which result in an order of supervision or a conviction for offenses under the Humane Care for Animals Act (rather than Class A misdemeanors under the Act). Eliminates multiple offenses and circumstances of the charge where records may currently be sealed. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM ID-SEALING ELIGIBILITY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-07SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-03-08SenateTo Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2026305.2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback