IL SB1400 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 24 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Reinserts the contents of the bill as introduced with the following changes. Restores current law with respect to annually reviewing discipline policies. Requires the State Board of Education to consult with stakeholders in its drafted and published guidance, and requires the guidance to be drafted and published on or before July 1, 2025. Changes certain references from "early intervention" to "intervention". Makes changes concerning suspensions, school exclusions, and disciplinary removals to alternative schools. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-STUDENT DISCIPLINE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-21SenateSent to the Governor
2024-05-24SenatePassed Both Houses
2024-05-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-005-000
2024-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2024-05-22HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2024-05-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2024-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
2024-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2024-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
2024-05-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2024-05-22HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 015-000-000
2024-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
2024-05-21HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 074-039-000
2024-05-21HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
2024-05-21HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Dave Vella
2024-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
2024-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2024-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
2024-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2024-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2024-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2024-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2024-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
2024-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
2024-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
2024-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2024-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2024-05-21HouseCommittee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
2024-05-21HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2024-05-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2024-05-17HouseFirst Reading
2024-05-17HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2024-05-17HouseArrived in House
2024-05-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
2024-05-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2024-05-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2024-05-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-002-000
2024-05-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2024-05-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
2024-05-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2024-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2024-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2024-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2024-05-15SenateDo Pass as Amended Education; 012-000-000
2024-05-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2024-05-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Education
2024-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2024-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2024-05-03SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
2024-04-19SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
2024-04-17SenatePostponed - Education
2024-04-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Education
2024-04-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2024-04-12SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
2024-04-10SenatePostponed - Education
2024-04-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Education
2024-04-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2024-04-05SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2024
2024-03-21SenatePostponed - Education
2024-03-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Education
2024-03-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2024-03-15SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024
2024-03-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
2024-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2024-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2024-01-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-assigned to Education
2024-01-10SenateRe-assigned to Education
2023-03-31SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2023-03-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2023-03-23SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023
2023-03-22SenatePostponed - Education
2023-03-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2023-03-10SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023
2023-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2023-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2023-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2023-02-22SenatePostponed - Education
2023-02-14SenateAssigned to Education
2023-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2023-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2023-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-20.14Amended CodeCitation Text
105510-22.6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback