IL SB1383 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0150
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0150
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act and Illinois Vehicle Code to provide for the issuance of Illinois Nurses license plates. Creates the Illinois Nurses Foundation Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Provides that the applicant shall pay an additional fee of $35 for original issuance of the plates, of which $20 shall be deposited into the Illinois Nurses Foundation Fund and $15 shall be deposited into the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund. Provides that an additional fee of $22 shall be charged for each renewal, of which $20 shall be deposited into the Illinois Nurses Foundation Fund and $2 shall be deposited into the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund. Provides that moneys in the Illinois Nurses Foundation Fund shall be paid as grants to the Illinois Nurses Foundation, to promote the health of the public by advancing the nursing profession in Illinois.
Title
VEH CD-SPECIAL PLATE:IL NURSES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-02 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0150 |
2013-08-02 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-02 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-005-000 |
2013-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Unes |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico |
2013-05-01 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2013-05-01 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Dan Brady |
2013-05-01 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dan Brady |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2013-05-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 007-000-000 |
2013-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2013-04-08 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-13 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer |
2013-03-13 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2013 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 6, 2013 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 012-000-000 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.826 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 3-699 | New Code | See Bill Text |