IL SB1379 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0321
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0321
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act in relation to an exemption from certain municipal utility taxes with respect to enterprises located in an enterprise zone or a Foreign Trade Zone or Sub-Zone. Extends the availability of the exemption from 2013 to 2017 and reduces the requisite job retention requirement from 1,000 jobs to 750 jobs. Effective immediately.
Title
PUB UTIL-TAXES-ENTERPRISE ZONE
Sponsors
Sen. David Koehler [D] | Rep. Michael Unes [R] | Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth [D] | Rep. David Leitch [R] |
Rep. Keith Sommer [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-12 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0321 |
2013-08-12 | Senate | Effective Date August 12, 2013 |
2013-08-12 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2013-05-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-009-000 |
2013-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2013-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon-Booth |
2013-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-000-000 |
2013-05-09 | House | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee |
2013-05-09 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 005-000-000 |
2013-05-02 | House | To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2013-04-08 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-13 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael Unes |
2013-03-13 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2013 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2013 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 008-000-000 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 9-222.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |