IL SB1379 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0043
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0043
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Water Supply Regulation Act. Provides that the rules of the Illinois Department of Public Health concerning the addition of fluoride to public water supplies shall incorporate the recommendations on optimal fluoridation for community water levels as proposed and adopted by the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. Effective immediately.
Title
PUBLIC WATER-FLUORIDATION
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Syverson [R] | Sen. William Delgado [D] | Sen. Christine Johnson [R] | Rep. Shane Cultra [R] |
Rep. Timothy Schmitz [R] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-28 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0043 |
2011-06-28 | Senate | Effective Date June 28, 2011 |
2011-06-28 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2011-06-03 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2011-05-05 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-05 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2011-05-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 010-000-000 |
2011-04-11 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2011-03-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-31 | House | First Reading |
2011-03-31 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz |
2011-03-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-03-31 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 3, 2011 |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Shane Cultra |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine J. Johnson |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2011 |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 010-000-000 |
2011-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 40 | 7a | Amended Code | Citation Text |