IL SB1371 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. Defines the term "drone". Prohibits the use of a manned or unmanned vehicle to take, pursue, or intentionally harass or disturb wild birds or mammals. Makes it unlawful to hunt on property where wildlife were spotted using manned or unmanned aircraft, including drones, unless 24 hours have passed since the aircraft has landed. Provides that the use of a drone as a hunting device constitutes a public nuisance, making the drone subject to confiscation.
Title
WILDLIFE-PROHIBIT DRONE USE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015 |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed April 21, 2015 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Verified |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 24, 2015 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Agriculture; 008-001-000 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
520 | 5 | 1.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 5 | 1.2e-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
520 | 5 | 2.33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |