IL SB1367 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Enrolled on December 1 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 1 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the State shall not accept any special terms and conditions for federal approval of any research and demonstration project waiver proposal submitted to the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services on June 4, 2014 under Section 1115 of the Social Security Act without prior approval from the General Assembly. Provides that the State shall not make any changes or amendments to any research and demonstration project waiver proposal submitted to the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services on June 4, 2014 under Section 1115 of the Social Security Act without prior approval from the General Assembly. Effective immediately.
Title
DHFS-MEDICAID-WAIVER PROPOSAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-01 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2016-12-01 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 047-000-003 |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2016-12-01 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2016-12-01 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-001-000 |
2016-11-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-11-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2016-11-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - December 1, 2016 |
2016-11-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2016-11-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2016-11-30 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2016-11-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2016-11-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2016-11-29 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-11-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-11-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-11-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 018-000-000 |
2016-11-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Appropriations-Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-11-29 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2016-11-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2016-11-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-11-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2016-11-22 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2016-11-22 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-29 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-29 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2015-04-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2015 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 16, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Human Services; 006-000-000 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |