IL SB1367 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Permits establishment of a county board of election commissioners in a county with a population of less than 200,000 but more than 175,000 persons that contains a municipality with a municipal board of election commissioners. Effective immediately.
Title
ELEC CD-ELECTION COMMISSIONERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Reported Back To Executive; 002-000-000 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Election Law |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 6-19.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 6A-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 6A-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 6A-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 6A-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1367&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB1367.htm |