IL SB1351 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois School Student Records Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STUDENT LOAN SERVICING RIGHTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 63 N: 48 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 063-048-001
2017-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-05-31HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2017-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-31HouseBalanced Budget Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-05-31HouseHome Rule Note Filed
2017-05-30HouseJudicial Note Filed
2017-05-30HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-05-29HouseCorrectional Note Filed
2017-05-28HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-05-26HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Filed
2017-05-26HouseState Debt Impact Note Filed
2017-05-26HousePension Note Filed
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-26HouseLand Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed
2017-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-05-25HouseState Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-05-25HousePension Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-05-25HouseLand Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-05-25HouseJudicial Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-05-25HouseHousing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-05-25HouseHome Rule Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-05-25HouseCorrectional Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-05-25HouseBalanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-05-24HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-24HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 006-004-000
2017-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-18HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-05-11HouseArrived in House
2017-05-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 034-015-001
2017-05-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Biss
2017-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Biss
2017-05-10SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-05-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Financial Institutions; 006-003-000
2017-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions
2017-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Biss
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Financial Institutions; 006-003-000
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions
2017-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-04-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-04-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-04-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-04-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2017-03-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass as Amended Financial Institutions; 006-002-000
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-03-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-03-07SenateAssigned to Financial Institutions
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105101Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback