IL SB1322 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on November 8 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-12-07 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Specialized Mental Health Rehabilitation Act of 2013. Provides that provisional licenses shall be awarded to every entity with a pending application for licensure on the effective date. Provides that the provisional licenses shall be awarded and in effect immediately upon the effective date of the amendatory Act. Effective July 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SMHRF-PROVISIONAL LICENSES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-08 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-07SenateSent to the Governor
2017-11-08SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-11-08SenateSenate Concurs
2017-11-08SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 054-000-000
2017-11-07SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 008-000-000
2017-11-07SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-11-07SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-11-07SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-11-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - November 7, 2017
2017-11-01SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2017-10-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2017-10-25House3/5 Vote Required
2017-10-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2017
2017-10-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2017-10-24HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000
2017-10-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-10-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2017-10-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-10-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-10-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2017-10-17HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-09-28HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-08-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-08-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-08-23HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-05HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-05-05HouseArrived in House
2017-05-04SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Steans
2017-05-04SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 007-000-000
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass Human Services; 009-000-000
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Human Services
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Human Services
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
210494-105Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1322&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1322.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1322eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1322enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1322sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1322ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1322ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1322_05042017_019000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB1322_10252017_008000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB1322ham002_11082017_018000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback