IL SB1296 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Healthy Workplace Act and amends the State Finance Act. Requires employers to provide specified paid sick days to employees. Sets forth the purposes for and manner in which the sick days may be used. Contains provisions regarding employer responsibilities, unlawful employer practices, and other matters. Provides that the Department of Labor shall administer the Act. Authorizes the imposition of civil penalties. Authorizes individuals to file civil actions with respect to violations. Creates the Healthy Workplace Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HEALTHY WORKPLACE ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Labor
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Labor
2017-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-04-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateDo Pass Labor; 011-003-000
2017-03-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-03-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Labor
2017-03-15SenatePostponed - Labor
2017-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Labor
2017-03-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-03-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Labor
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Labor
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-02-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-02-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.878New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback