IL SB1296 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Insured's Independent Counsel Act. Provides that if an insurer has a duty to defend an insured under a policy of insurance and a significant and actual conflict of interest arises that imposes a duty on the insurer to provide independent counsel to the insured, unless the insured waives the right to independent counsel in writing, the insurer shall provide independent counsel to the insured. Provides that the phrase "significant and actual conflict of interest" excludes specified circumstances. Adds provisions governing: the selection of independent counsel; retention of other counsel by an insured; duties of the independent counsel; privileged information; waiver of the right to select independent counsel; and cooperation between the insurer, insured, and independent counsel.
Title
INDEPENDENT COUNSEL-INSUREDS
Sponsors
Sen. John Mulroe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-10-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-10-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 012-000-000 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |