IL SB1291 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Universities and State Employees Articles of the Illinois Pension Code to specify that severance payments are not included in "earnings" or "compensation" for pension purposes. Amends various Acts relating to the governance of public universities in Illinois and the Public Community College Act. Provides that, with respect to an executive administrator of a university or community college whose final rate of earnings exceeds $200,000, the governing board of the university or community college district may not award a severance payment to that employee that exceeds 30% of his or her final rate of earnings unless the severance payment is reviewed by the Board of Higher Education or the Illinois Community College Board and the respective Board approves the payment by a record vote of a majority of its members. Effective immediately.
Title
SEVERANCE PAYMENTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015 |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2015-03-18 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Public Higher Education Executive Compensation |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 305 | 90 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 520 | 75 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 660 | 5-185 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 665 | 10-185 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 670 | 15-185 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 675 | 20-190 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 680 | 25-185 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 685 | 30-195 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 690 | 35-190 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 805 | 3-29.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 14-103.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 15-111 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1291&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB1291.htm |