IL SB1285 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Corporate Accountability for Tax Expenditures Act. Provides that the Unified Economic Development Budget shall be due within 6 months (instead of 3 months) after the end of the fiscal year. Amends the Department of Revenue Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. For the purposes of mandatory payments by electronic funds transfer, provides that the annual tax liability includes motor fuel tax liability and fees under the Environmental Impact Fee law. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Makes changes concerning deposits into the Income Tax Refund Fund, the Fund for the Advancement of Education, and the Commitment to Human Services Fund. Amends the Property Tax Code to allow the Department of Revenue to publish equalization factors on its website. Amends the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, and the Use Tax Act to make technical corrections. Amends various tax Acts to provide that, if a payment provided for under one of those Acts exceeds the taxpayer's liability under that Act, then the taxpayer may credit the excess payment against liability subsequently to be remitted to the Department of Revenue. Amends the Renewable Energy, Energy Efficiency, and Coal Resources Development Law of 1997 and the Energy Assistance Act to incorporate certain provisions of the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REVENUE-VARIOUS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-09HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-08HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2017-05-08HouseArrived in House
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 4 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-05SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
2017-05-04SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 5, 2017
2017-05-04SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2017-05-04SenateDo Pass as Amended Revenue; 009-000-000
2017-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 5 Adopted
2017-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 5 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2017-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2017-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-04-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2017-04-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-26SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-04-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Revenue
2017-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue
2017-04-06SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Revenue
2017-03-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue
2017-03-16SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2017-03-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Revenue
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2025052505-210Amended CodeCitation Text
20250539c-1Amended CodeCitation Text
206876-5Amended CodeCitation Text
206876-8New CodeSee Bill Text
2071510Amended CodeCitation Text
230152Amended CodeCitation Text
230205Amended CodeCitation Text
230253Amended CodeCitation Text
230309Amended CodeCitation Text
23558-2Amended CodeCitation Text
301056z-18Amended CodeCitation Text
3052013Amended CodeCitation Text
3052019New CodeSee Bill Text
351053-5Amended CodeCitation Text
351053-5.5Amended CodeCitation Text
351059Amended CodeCitation Text
351103-5.5Amended CodeCitation Text
351109Amended CodeCitation Text
351153-5.5Amended CodeCitation Text
351159Amended CodeCitation Text
351202-5.5Amended CodeCitation Text
351203Amended CodeCitation Text
351205jAmended CodeCitation Text
351281-40Amended CodeCitation Text
351302Amended CodeCitation Text
351353Amended CodeCitation Text
3514310-30Amended CodeCitation Text
351456Amended CodeCitation Text
3517510Amended CodeCitation Text
3520017-20Amended CodeCitation Text
3520017-40Amended CodeCitation Text
352008-35Amended CodeCitation Text
354502-45Amended CodeCitation Text
354502-50Amended CodeCitation Text
355901Amended CodeCitation Text
3550513Amended CodeCitation Text
355052bAmended CodeCitation Text
355055Amended CodeCitation Text
355055aAmended CodeCitation Text
356152a.2Amended CodeCitation Text
356153Amended CodeCitation Text
356202a.2Amended CodeCitation Text
356306Amended CodeCitation Text
356365-50Amended CodeCitation Text
356402-11Amended CodeCitation Text
356402-9Amended CodeCitation Text
415125315Amended CodeCitation Text
41513565Amended CodeCitation Text
415555.10Amended CodeCitation Text
5047031Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1006Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1006.5Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1006.7Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1007Amended CodeCitation Text
5555-1008.5Amended CodeCitation Text
65511-74.3-6Amended CodeCitation Text
6558-11-1Amended CodeCitation Text
6558-11-1.3Amended CodeCitation Text
6558-11-1.4Amended CodeCitation Text
6558-11-1.6Amended CodeCitation Text
6558-11-1.7Amended CodeCitation Text
6558-11-5Amended CodeCitation Text
6558-11-6bAmended CodeCitation Text
70160530Amended CodeCitation Text
7021013Amended CodeCitation Text
7036105.01Amended CodeCitation Text
7036154.03Amended CodeCitation Text
7037204Amended CodeCitation Text
7075025Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback