IL SB1284 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Creates the offense of Caller ID spoofing. Provides that a person commits the offense when he or she, in connection with any telecommunications service or voice over Internet protocol (VoIP) service, knowingly causes any caller identification service to transmit misleading or inaccurate caller identification information with the intent to deceive, defraud, mislead, harass, cause emotional distress, or wrongfully obtain anything of value. Provides exemptions. Provides that a first offense is a Class B misdemeanor and a second or subsequent offense is a Class A misdemeanor.
Title
CRIM CD-CALLER-ID-SPOOFING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1284&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1284.htm |