IL SB1281 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that certificates of registration that are issued or renewed on or after July 1, 2017 shall expire one year (currently, 5 years) after the issuance or last renewal of that certificate of registration. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ROTA-REGISTRATION RENEWAL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-01-03HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-07-06HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 31, 2017
2017-06-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017
2017-06-28HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-28HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2017-06-27HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-06-27HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-06-27HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-06-27HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-05-29HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-05-15HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-15HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-12HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Revenue; 008-000-000
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
351202aAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback