IL SB1281 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that certificates of registration that are issued or renewed on or after July 1, 2017 shall expire one year (currently, 5 years) after the issuance or last renewal of that certificate of registration. Effective immediately.
Title
ROTA-REGISTRATION RENEWAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-09-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-01-03 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-07-06 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 31, 2017 |
2017-06-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017 |
2017-06-28 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-06-28 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-06-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-06-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-06-27 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2017-06-27 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-06-27 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017 |
2017-06-27 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-05-29 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2017-05-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-15 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 008-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 120 | 2a | Amended Code | Citation Text |