IL SB1268 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Permanent Legal Resident Voting Act. Provides that every election authority in this State shall prepare a special permanent legal residents voter registration application and maintain a voter registration list for permanent legal residents within the election authority's jurisdiction. Provides that permanent legal residents may register to vote using the special permanent legal residents voter registration application if they meet the other qualifications for voting. Provides that permanent legal residents registered to vote under the Act may vote in any election in which a referendum involving a property tax levy appears on the ballot. Provides that permanent legal residents registered to vote under the Act shall be given a special ballot with only the referendum or referenda involving a property tax levy on the ballot, and shall not be given ballots to vote on any other issue. Provides that the State Board of Elections may adopt rules to implement the Act. Effective immediately.
Title
PERM LEGAL RESIDENT VOTING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1268&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1268.htm |