IL SB1268 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0286
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0286
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Structured Settlement Protection Act. Provides that the structured settlement obligor and the annuity issuer shall be discharged from any and all liability by complying with a court order approving a transfer of structured settlement payment rights, and shall not have or incur any liability to the payee, transferee, or assignee as a result of the failure of the court order, transfer agreement, disclosure statement, or the transfer proceeding to comply with the Act, another applicable State or federal statute relating to structured settlement transfers, or any other law. Provides that an application for approval of a structured settlement transfer shall be brought in the circuit court of the county in which the payee is domiciled at the time the transfer agreement was signed or, if the payee is not domiciled in this State or in any other state that has enacted a statute that requires court approval of a transfer of structured settlement payment rights, then the application may be brought in the county in which the structured settlement obligor or annuity issuer is domiciled or has its principal place of business in this State. Provides what information is necessary to make an application to the court under the Act. Provides that a court may review all applications for transfer filed, and may approve or deny a transfer despite the existence of terms in the underlying settlement agreement, qualified assignment, related annuity, or in any other relevant document that purports to restrict or preclude the payee's right or power to assign or transfer structured settlement payment rights. Makes other changes.
Title
STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT TRANSFER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-05 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0286 |
2015-08-05 | Senate | Effective Date August 5, 2015 |
2015-08-05 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2015-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015 |
2015-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2015-05-04 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2015-04-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Haine |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 26, 2015 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 012-000-000 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 153 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 153 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 153 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 153 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 153 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |