IL SB1262 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0499
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0499
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Adds a Section providing that a county board of any non-home rule county may tax and regulate places for eating, amusement, theatricals, and other exhibitions, shows, and amusements in unincorporated areas of the county developed pursuant to a special use and subject to the local land resource management plan. Provides that a county board of any non-home rule county may enter into intergovernmental agreements with any one or more adjoining municipality for the purpose of implementing these taxes and regulations. Amends the Municipal Code. Provides that a municipality may enter into an intergovernmental agreement with a county to implement these taxes and regulations. Effective immediately.
Title
MUNI-COUNTY CDS TAX & REG
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-13 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 75 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 75 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-29 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0499 |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Effective Date January 29, 2016 |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2016-01-13 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 046-000-000 |
2016-01-13 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 046-000-000 |
2016-01-13 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-01-13 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-01-07 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) |
2016-01-07 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-12-07 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-12-07 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-12-07 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2015-12-07 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Terry Link |
2015-12-07 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2015-12-07 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Terry Link |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2015-12-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - December 7, 2015 |
2015-12-04 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2015-12-02 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 075-035-000 |
2015-12-02 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2015-12-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-12-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2015-11-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2015-11-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-11-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2015-11-09 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2015-10-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 4, 2015 |
2015-09-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 31, 2015 |
2015-08-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) September 30, 2015 |
2015-07-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 31, 2015 |
2015-06-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 31, 2015 |
2015-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2015 |
2015-05-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-26 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000 |
2015-05-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2015-05-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2015-05-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2015-05-22 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-18 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2015-05-18 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2015-05-18 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2015-05-18 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2015 |
2015-05-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015 |
2015-04-20 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-04-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-16 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2015-04-14 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 043-003-000 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 24, 2015 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 008-002-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-1058.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 11-42-5.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |