IL SB1258 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the Department of Natural Resources to convey, in exchange for $1, certain real estate in McHenry County to the Fox Waterway Agency. Provides that the conveyance is subject to: (1) existing public utilities, existing public roads, and any and all reservations, easements, encumbrances, covenants, and restrictions of record; and (2) the express condition that any proceeds from the sale of the real property shall be utilized for the purchase and development of an alternate dredge material disposal site or sites. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DNR-CONVEY REAL ESTATE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2017-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2017
2017-03-08SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 011-000-000
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2017-02-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-02-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback