IL SB1251 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Historic Preservation Agency for its FY 10 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2009.
Title
$HISTORIC PRESERVATION AGENCY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-12 | Session Sine Die | |
2010-06-27 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b). | |
2010-06-27 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b). | |
2010-06-27 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b). | |
2010-06-27 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2010-05-06 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Appropriations II | |
2010-05-06 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Appropriations II | |
2010-05-06 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Appropriations II | |
2010-03-04 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Appropriations II | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Matt Murphy; -Althoff | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Appropriations II | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations II | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter | |
2010-02-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 24, 2010 | |
2010-02-23 | Second Reading | |
2010-02-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 23, 2010 | |
2010-02-18 | Approved for Consideration Assignments | |
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-26 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 27, 2009 | |
2009-05-26 | Do Pass Appropriations I; 007-004-000 | |
2009-05-17 | Assigned to Appropriations I | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-06 | First Reading | |
2009-02-06 | Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan | |
2009-02-06 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter |