IL SB1242 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Veterans Affairs Act. Provides that the Department of Veterans' Affairs shall assist the superintendent and staff of any Veterans Assistance Commission created under the Military Veterans Assistance Act with the United States Department of Veterans Affairs' process of becoming accredited as a service organization representative of the Illinois Department of Veterans' Affairs. Provides that this assistance shall include, but not be limited to, a certifying official of the Illinois Department of Veterans' Affairs certifying with his or her signature on behalf of the superintendent and staff of a Veterans Assistance Commission the United States Department of Veterans Affairs' Application for Accreditation as a Service Organization Representative, and the Illinois Department of Veterans' Affairs filing the application with the United States Department of Veterans Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VETERANS' AFFAIRS-COMMISSIONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2017
2017-03-08SenateDo Pass Veterans Affairs; 005-000-004
2017-03-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-02-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Veterans Affairs
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2028052Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback