IL SB1235 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Allows for the disclosure of investigatory files and reports of the Office of an Executive Inspector General to, among other exceptions, the head of a State agency affected by or involved in an investigation. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ST OFFICIALS ETHICS-EXEMPTIONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019
2019-04-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 9, 2019
2019-04-04SenateDo Pass Executive; 016-000-000
2019-04-03SenateAssignments Re-refers to Executive
2019-03-28SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 12, 2019
2019-03-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateTo Subcommittee on Governmental Operations
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
543020-95Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback