IL SB1221 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0316
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal date of the Medical Practice Act of 1987 from December 31, 2019 to January 1, 2025. Amends the Medical Practice Act of 1987. Removes obsolete language regarding certain transfers of money from the Illinois State Medical Disciplinary Fund to the Local Government Tax Fund. In provisions concerning disposition and collection of fees, removes language imposing fees for wall certificates and for the rosters of persons licensed as physicians. Provides that notice of certain proceedings before the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation or the Medical Disciplinary Board may be served by personal delivery, email to the respondent's email address of record, or mail to the respondent's address of record (rather than by personal delivery or by certified or registered mail). Provides that hearing officers may administer oaths at any hearing that the Medical Disciplinary Board or Department is authorized by law to conduct. Adds the report of the hearing officer and exhibits to the list of items that constitute the record of the proceedings for a hearing involving disciplinary action. Removes language requiring the Department to furnish a copy of the record to any person interested in the hearing and to provide the name and contact information for the certified shorthand reporter who transcribed the testimony. Requires the Disciplinary Board to serve to an accused person a written report of the Medical Disciplinary Board's findings and recommendations either personally or by mail or email (rather than personally or by registered or certified mail). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAL PRACTICE ACT-SUNSET

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0316
2019-08-09SenateEffective Date August 9, 2019
2019-08-09SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2019-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 005-000-000
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 31, 2019
2019-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2019-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
2019-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-05-22HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-05-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2019-05-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000
2019-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-05-14HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2019-05-14HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-05-14HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-14HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-04-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-30HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-29HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-04-15HouseArrived in House
2019-04-12SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2019-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-04-12SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Jones
2019-04-12SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 005-000-000
2019-03-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
2019-03-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019
2019-03-13SenateSecond Reading
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2019-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 5, 2019
2019-02-21SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities; 006-000-000
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-06SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5804.29Repealed CodeCitation Text
5804.39Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1221&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1221.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1221eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1221enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0316.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1221sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1221ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1221ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1221_04122019_040000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100SB1221_05302019_006000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100SB1221ham002_05312019_036000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback