IL SB1215 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Assembly Organization Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the deposit of books, bills, documents, and papers with the Secretary of State.
Title
GA-UNIT OF LOCAL GOVT PROHIBIT
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Toi Hutchinson [D] | Sen. Laura Ellman [D] |
Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Rep. Sam Yingling [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2021-01-08 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-01-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-01-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-01-08 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-005-000 |
2021-01-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-01-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2021-01-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2021-01-02 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-07 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2019-03-07 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 5, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 21, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 008-000-000 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 5 | 3.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |