IL SB1202 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Oil and Gas Wells on Public Lands Act. Provides that on and after the effective date of the amendatory Act, no new permits shall be issued for surface extraction activities on lands owned by the Department of Natural Resources or the federal government. Prohibits the Department of Natural Resources from entering into contracts in writing designating any person as the permittee of the State of Illinois with the exclusive right to prospect and explore public lands of the State of Illinois for the occurrence of petroleum. Repeals provisions governing certain petroleum leases, right of way over public lands, and preferential rights to prospecting permits. Effective immediately.
Title
OIL & GAS-PERMIT MORATORIUM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Postponed - Environment and Conservation |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Postponed - Environment and Conservation |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Postponed - Environment and Conservation |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 615 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 11 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 17 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 18 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 21 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |