IL SB1197 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Creates a new Article concerning audits. Requires that each election authority (i) conduct an election day audit of a random sample of 10% of votes cast and (ii) provide by contract or employment for the performance by one or more independent auditors of post-election parallel tabulations and audits. Provides for the scope of the audits and the resulting reports. Requires that optical scan technology and direct recording electronic voting systems meet certain federal and independent testing standards. Creates a voluntary tax checkoff for the Fund. With respect to early voting, requires that an election authority using only direct recording electronic voting systems have paper ballots available for voters wishing to use them. Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Election Integrity Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Provides that the amendatory Act may be referred to as the Illinois Election Integrity Act.
Title
ELEC CD-EQUIPMENT/AUDITS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Election Law |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 17A-10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 17A-100 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 17A-15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 17A-20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 17A-25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 17A-30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 17A-35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 17A-40 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 17A-45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 17A-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 17A-50 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 17A-55 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 17A-60 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 17A-65 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 17A-70 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 17A-75 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 17A-80 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 17A-85 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 17A-90 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 17A-95 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 19A-75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 24B-16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 24B-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 24C-16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 24C-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 24C-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 17A heading | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.891 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1197&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1197.htm |